open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04014
    Party Name:Bollfrass et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lodged Proposed Document]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement ]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike ]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter ]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Doc (NOT Motion/Complaint/Cross/Counter/3rd Party Claim)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1180742
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =