open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04392
    Party Name:Cobin v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party ]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike ]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1182754
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =