open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04447
    Party Name:Lugo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Response]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Magistrate Judge Trial]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA ]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1183970
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =