open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00926-1
    Party Name:USA v. Soloman-Canahui
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing and/or Disposition Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings re Admissions/Pleas]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement ]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant & Order of Referral]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1168386
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =