open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04618
    Party Name:Miranda v. Casa Grande, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1188574
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =