open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04699
    Party Name:Briggs v. Phoenix, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1190721
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =