open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04698
    Party Name:LLC Wholesale Supply LLC v. United States of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1190755
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =