open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04786
    Party Name:Robinson v. Phoenix, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request ]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1192592
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =