open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04790--JFM
    Party Name:Stuart v. Phoenix Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1192750
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =