open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-bk-10168-
    Party Name:WESLEY ANDREW GLOGNER
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Summary of Schedules]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Schedules]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: NOWAK, TRUDY A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?762358
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =