open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-10167-
    Party Name:JESSE JOE PEDROZA and FRANCISCA VARELA
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [oMinute Entry Order]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Reaffirmation Agreement and Motion to Approve - Pro Se Debtor]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:September 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Form)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Reaffirmation Agreement - Pro Se Debtor]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?762357
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =