open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-10166-
    Party Name:SALAHUDDIN MUHAMMAD
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint (Reinstatements/Amended/Conversions)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [oReinstating Case]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Vacate (Motion to)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?762356
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =