open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-10164-
    Party Name:MANUELLA J ESTORGA
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint (Reinstatements/Amended/Conversions)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oReinstating Case]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?762354
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =