open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-10163-PS
    Party Name:ALISON RAE MARONA
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?762353
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =