open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04982
    Party Name:Barrios v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case No Longer Referred ]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause ]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference ]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1197388
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =