open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05126
    Party Name:McCall et al v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [More Definite Statement]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim ]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1201723
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =