open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00451
    Party Name:Anderson v. Tucson Unified School District
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1201863
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =