open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cr-01083-1
    Party Name:USA v. Valdez-Maldonado
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Lodged Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Ability Statement]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [DOJ Conflict Memo]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1201889
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =