open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05186
    Party Name:Armenta v. Goodyear, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1202966
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =