open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05254
    Party Name:Enwia v. Surprise, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Joinder of Additional Parties]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder of Additional Parties]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1204403
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =