open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05300
    Party Name:Maples v. Pinal, County of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Representation Statement]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1205991
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =