open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05308
    Party Name:West v. University of Phoenix Incorporated
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1206192
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =