open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05382
    Party Name:Southwest Fair Housing Council et al v. Hong Ning House of Phoenix et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case ]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1208066
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =