open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05456
    Party Name:Butler et al v. Tempe, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Counterclaim ]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1209628
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =