open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05492
    Party Name:Caraffa v. Tempe Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal - Amended]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause ]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment ]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Service Packet)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1210555
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =