open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-02826
    Party Name:Heisel #142772 v. Mesa Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Service Packet)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause ]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1122255
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =