open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05209
    Party Name:Millsaps v. Shinn
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Habeas Petition (State/2254)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1203673
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =