open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:08-cr-01256-1
    Party Name:USA v. Main
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?409089
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =