open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-cr-02687-1
    Party Name:USA v. Villa-Erunes
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment Issued/Judgment of Probation Issued]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings re Admissions/Pleas]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement ]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant & Order of Referral]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Minute Entry]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgment of Trial Date]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1210172
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =