open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-ap-00403-
    Party Name:PINAL COUNTY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. BALDERRAMA
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Virtual Minute Entry]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Stipulation for Dismissal of Complaint]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [oSetting Hearing]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued (Form) ]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?766873
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =