open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05665--DMF
    Party Name:Murrell v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lodged Proposed Document]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1215861
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =