open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:12-cr-01755-1
    Party Name:USA v. Jaime-Castillo
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order/Judgment Revoking Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Disposition Hearing]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing and/or Disposition Memorandum]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings re Admissions/Pleas]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?721650
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =