open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05714
    Party Name:Perkins v. Synchrony Bank
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1217619
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =