open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05745
    Party Name:Devine v. Phoenix Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Reopened]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Service Packet)]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1218594
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =