open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05772
    Party Name:Federal Trade Commission v. University of Phoenix Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Consent]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Approve Consent Judgment]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1219197
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =