open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05815
    Party Name:Ball v. Scottsdale, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw ]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1220189
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =