open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05834
    Party Name:Ivchenko v. Scottsdale, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference ]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request ]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1220634
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =