open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00078
    Party Name:Harris et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Redacted Document ]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1224826
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =