open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00092
    Party Name:Gonzalez et al v. Tempe, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1225107
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =