open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:20-cr-08011-2
    Party Name:USA v. Chinchee-Clawson et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [DOJ Conflict Memo]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1226486
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =