open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00167
    Party Name:Nolan v. Mesa, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1226666
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =