open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00159--MHB
    Party Name:Villa v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend ]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Amend]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1226763
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =