open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00300
    Party Name:Petramala v. Phoenix, City of, et al.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for TRO ]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Service Packet)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1230371
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =