open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00339
    Party Name:BBG Enterprises LLC et al v. Polish et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1231692
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =