open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00337
    Party Name:Myers et al v. FCA US LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1231683
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =