open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00338
    Party Name:Erwig v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA ]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1231684
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =