open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00070
    Party Name:Hill v. United States Automobile Association Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Other]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1224766
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =