open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00548--JZB
    Party Name:Grimes v. Tempe Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received ]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1238454
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =