open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00673
    Party Name:Jackson-Anderson v. Peoria, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1239666
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =