open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00681
    Party Name:Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated v. Universal Health Services Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1239704
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =